NH HB1657 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 248-55 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 248-55 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting firearms in certain public places.
Title
Prohibiting firearms in certain public places.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Pamela Brown [D] | Rep. Wayne Burton [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Rep. Deanna Rollo [D] | Rep. Cynthia Chase [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 248 N: 55 NV: 57 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 248-55 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 89 |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 89 |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2016 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/11/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 22 |