NH HB1652 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 323-7 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 323-7 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Including ski area ticket sales under the meals and rooms tax and dedicating the revenue to the governor's scholarship program for New Hampshire resident students.
Title
Including ski area ticket sales under the meals and rooms tax and dedicating the revenue to the governor's scholarship program for New Hampshire resident students.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Thompson [D] | Rep. Michelle St. John [D] | Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
Rep. Jennie Gomarlo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - ITL (Y: 323 N: 7 NV: 34 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 323-7 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 40 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 37 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 30 |