NH HB1652 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-14 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-14 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to default budgets.
Title
Relative to default budgets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building301 |
2018-09-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building301 |
2018-03-21 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 293-22 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 36 |
2018-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 36 |
2018-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2018-0743h: Amendment Failed DV 92-209 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 35 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0743h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 74 |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/21/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/02/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 18 |