NH HB1651 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Removed from Consent (Rep. Testerman) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Removed from Consent (Rep. Testerman) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding sexual reassignment to the definition of child abuse.
Title
Adding sexual reassignment to the definition of child abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Testerman) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Lay HB1651 on Table (Rep. DeSimone): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 8-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2022 01:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/15/2022 01:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |