NH HB1651 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 229; Eff. 6/9/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 229; Eff. 6/9/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duties of the commission to review child abuse fatalities.
Title
Relative to the duties of the commission to review child abuse fatalities.
Sponsors
Rep. Skip Berrien [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. John Balcom [R] |
Rep. John Fothergill [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 229; Eff. 6/9/2016 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 58 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1555s (Rep. Gargasz): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 20 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1555s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1555s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016 Senate Journal 16 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1555s, 05/05/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 04/21/2016, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-02-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0097h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/04/2016 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2016-02-04 | House | Amendment #2016-0097h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/04/2016 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2016-02-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0097h (NT) for 02/04/2016 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 2 |
2016-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building206 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 4 P. 22 |