NH HB1650 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 241-88 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removing education as required by law as a criterion for determining child neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing education as required by law as a criterion for determining child neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - Interim Study (Y: 241 N: 88 NV: 27 Abs: 35) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 241-88 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 63
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0783h (NT)
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 36
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-02-13House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-31House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-01-03House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback