NH HB1648 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the home cultivation of cannabis plants and the possession of certain cannabis-infused products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the home cultivation of cannabis plants and the possession of certain cannabis-infused products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 236 N: 112 NV: 12 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateVacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7
2020-02-20HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0252h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 236-112 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 7
2020-02-20HouseAmendment # 2020-0252h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 House Journal 5 P. 7
2020-01-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0252h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 29
2020-01-09HouseExecutive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-12-12HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 30

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback