NH HB1647 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-18 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-18 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department of health and human services to license supervised visitation centers.
Title
Requiring the department of health and human services to license supervised visitation centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-18 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-06-20 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/26/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Executive Departments and Administration for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2433 | |
2012-02-08 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-01-25 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 8 (Vote 11-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 6, PG.294 | |
2012-01-18 | House Executive Session: 1/25/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-18 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/24/2012 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-01-10 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/16/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-12-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 7, PG.363 |