NH HB1639 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the youth risk behavior survey in schools.
Title
Relative to the youth risk behavior survey in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - OTPA (Y: 183 N: 164 NV: 21 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/17/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Ward, Hennessey, Kahn; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Ward Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1855s and Requests CofC (Reps. Ladd, Boehm, Cordelli, Hobson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1855s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1855s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Remove HB 1639 from the Consent Calendar; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1855s, 05/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 04/19/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-164 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-20 | House | Amendment # 2022-0189h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0189h (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |