NH HB1637 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring parents of public school students to submit a survey when electing an education freedom account.
Title
Requiring parents of public school students to submit a survey when electing an education freedom account.
Sponsors
Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. Bonnie Ham [R] | Rep. James Allard [R] |
Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |