NH HB1636 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reconsider non-concurrence with amendments 1427s; 1851s; 1898s; and 1925s (Rep. White): Motion Failed DV 161-181 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Reconsider non-concurrence with amendments 1427s; 1851s; 1898s; and 1925s (Rep. White): Motion Failed DV 161-181 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study teacher preparation and education programs, relative to chartered public school use of unused school district facilities, and establishing education freedom savings accounts for students.
Title
Establishing a committee to study teacher preparation and education programs, relative to chartered public school use of unused school district facilities, and establishing education freedom savings accounts for students.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - Non Concur (Y: 180 N: 163 NV: 17 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - CofC (Y: 168 N: 173 NV: 19 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Reagan Floor Amendment 1925s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment 1898s (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment 1851s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Remainder of Committee Amendment 1427s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - CofC (Y: 168 N: 173 NV: 19 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Reagan Floor Amendment 1925s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment 1898s (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment 1851s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Remainder of Committee Amendment 1427s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Reconsider non-concurrence with amendments 1427s; 1851s; 1898s; and 1925s (Rep. White): Motion Failed DV 161-181 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1427s; 1851s; 1898s; and 1925s (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-163 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1427s; 1851s; 1898s; and 1925s and Requests CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 168-173 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1427s, 2018-1851s, 2018-1898s, and 2018-1925s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Without Objection, the Clerk is authorized to make technical and administrative corrections which are necessary to reflect the intent of the Senate, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Floor Amendment # 2018-1925s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2018-1898s, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Amendment Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendments # 2018-1427s and #2018-1851s; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2018-1851s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Remainder of Committee Amendment 2018-1427; Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment 2018-1427: Section 2, I. (a) and (b), Section 4, and Section 7; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment 2018-1427: Section 2, I. (a) and (b), Section 4, and Section 7; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1427s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Chair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1427s Non-Germane, 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1427s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1427s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1427s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 29 |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 14 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 18 |