NH HB1633 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requiring COVID-19 vaccination for school attendance.
Title
Relative to requiring COVID-19 vaccination for school attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-11 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |