NH HB1630 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/01/2014; Chapter 0329; Section 4 Effective 10/3/2014. Section 5 Effective 12/15/2015. Remainder Effective 7/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to gaming in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to gaming in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-04HouseSigned by the Governor on 8/01/2014; Chapter 0329; Section 4 Effective 10/3/2014. Section 5 Effective 12/15/2015. Remainder Effective 7/1/2015.
2014-06-25HouseEnrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014)
2014-06-25SenateEnrolled (6/4/14)
2014-06-17HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2014-2023eba Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 6/4/2014)
2014-06-04SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2023e Adopted
2014-06-04HouseConference Committee Report #1926c; Adopted, Voice Vote
2014-06-04SenateConference Committee Report 1926c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15
2014-05-28SenateConference Committee Report #2014-1926c; Senate Amendment, Filed
2014-05-22HouseCommittee of Conference Meeting: 5/23/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2014-05-22SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Reagan, Boutin, and Soucy; Senate Journal 14
2014-05-22SenateSen. Odell Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
2014-05-21HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Shurtleff, Wallner, Chandler, Nordgren
2014-05-21HouseRep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014)
2014-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1810s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13
2014-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment 1810s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2014-05-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1810s, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18
2014-05-01SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 11
2014-04-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16
2014-04-01SenateHearing: 4/15/14, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13
2014-03-24SenateIntroduced 3/13/14 and Referred to Ways and Means
2014-03-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0409h Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-05HouseAdopt Amendment #0409h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote
2014-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0409h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13
2014-01-28HouseExecutive Session: 2/04/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-28HouseFull Committee Work Session: 2/4/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 1/31/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-22HouseFull Committee Work Session: 1/28/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-10House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2014-01-10House===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 1/21/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-09HouseFull Committee Work Session: 1/21/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2014-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback