NH HB1629 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Hearing: Jan 29 @ 3:00 pm in Legislative Office Building 301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to training and procedures for zoning and planning boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to training and procedures for zoning and planning boards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2020-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-12-09HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback