NH HB1624 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 15 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to students with disabilities participating in co-curricular activities and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to students with disabilities participating in co-curricular activities and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] |
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1558s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1558s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1558s, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1166h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Amendment # 2022-1166h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1166h (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-21 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 03/21/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-03-14 | House | Division Work Session: 03/21/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/15/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/12/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-22 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |