NH HB1622 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of passenger restraints in motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of passenger restraints in motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - OTPA (Y: 171 N: 114 NV: 66 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-13HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0532h and 1130h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 171-114 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 205
2020-03-13HouseFLAM # 2020-1130h (Rep. Sykes): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 205
2020-03-13HouseAmendment # 2020-0532h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 205
2020-03-13HouseLay on Table (Rep. Horn): Motion Failed DV 133-148 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 205
2020-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0532h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 76
2020-02-18House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2020-02-05House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2020-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-12-06HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 29

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback