NH HB1614 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Conference Committee Report 2013c: Failed, Regular Calendar 150-187 05/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Conference Committee Report 2013c: Failed, Regular Calendar 150-187 05/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the international registration plan and relative to registration of semi-trailers.
Title
Relative to the international registration plan and relative to registration of semi-trailers.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Timothy Soucy [D] | Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] |
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D] | Rep. Skip Cleaver [D] | Rep. James Grenier [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 2013c (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Adopt CofC (Y: 150 N: 187 NV: 29 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Adopt CofC (Y: 150 N: 187 NV: 29 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2013c: Failed, Regular Calendar 150-187 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2013c; Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Adopted; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2013c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Packard Replaces Rep. Abear 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Morse Replaces Senator Watters; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-14 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Sanborn, Watters; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Steven Smith, T. Walsh, True, Abear 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1609s and 1840s and Requests CofC (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1840s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1840s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1840s, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1840s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1609s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1609s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved to Remove HB 1614 from the Consent Calendar; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1609s, 04/26/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 15 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 17 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 17 |