NH HB1614 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the criminal penalty for prostitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the criminal penalty for prostitution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-27HouseDied on Table
2016-03-10HouseLay on Table (Rep. Murphy): Motion Adopted DV 152-145 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 112
2016-03-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass House Calendar 14 P. 87
2016-03-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 87
2016-03-01House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-03-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-01-13HousePublic Hearing: 01/28/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building204
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback