NH HB1613 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 120; 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 120; 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain liquor manufacturers.
Title
Relative to certain liquor manufacturers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/27/2022; Chapter 120; 07/01/2022 |
2022-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13A |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0830h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0830h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0830h (NT) (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-22 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |