NH HB1613 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sen. Odell Refused to Accede to House Request For C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sen. Odell Refused to Accede to House Request For C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment of the Medicaid enhancement tax.
Title
Relative to payment of the Medicaid enhancement tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Susan Almy [D] |
Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1865s (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1865s (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Odell Refused to Accede to House Request For C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Wallner, Almy, Rosenwald, Hess |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1711s New Title, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment #2014-1865s New Title, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1711s New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1711s, New Title, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Hearing:===RECONVENE===5/6/14, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Hearing:===RECESSED===4/29/14, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Hearing:===RECONVENE===4/15/14, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing:===RECESSED===4/15/14, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0224h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Adopt Amendment #0224h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0224h for Feb 5 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/28/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 1/23/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-12-19 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |