NH HB1610 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring sellers of real property to disclose certain information concerning environmental hazards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring sellers of real property to disclose certain information concerning environmental hazards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 8
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-03-06HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. McConnell) 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 8
2018-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback