NH HB161 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 232; Eff. 7/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 232; Eff. 7/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to beverage sales at farmers' markets and relative to liquor commission sales.
Title
Relative to beverage sales at farmers' markets and relative to liquor commission sales.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - C of C Report 2329 (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 232; Eff. 7/1/2017 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2329c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 21 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2329c; Regular Calendar 21Y-2N, Adopted; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, #2017-2329c; 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-09 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Innis, French, Lasky; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Innis Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Biggie, Butler, Azarian 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 3 |
2017-06-01 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1698s and Requests CofC (Reps. Hunt, Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 3 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1698s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1698s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1698s, 05/18/2017; Senate Calendar 23 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 19 |
2017-03-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-03-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2017 (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 03/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-17 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-14 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/23/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 8 |
2017-02-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 8 |
2017-02-09 | House | Special Order to beginning of regular calendar Without Objection House Journal 6 P. 8 |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/09/2017 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 9 |
2017-01-19 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/25/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 19 |