NH HB161 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the termination of a management contract by a condominium association.
Title
Relative to the termination of a management contract by a condominium association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 767 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 390 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 210 |