NH HB1609 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-148 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a local option for an additional surcharge on occupancy under the meals and rooms tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a local option for an additional surcharge on occupancy under the meals and rooms tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - ITL (Y: 178 N: 148 NV: 34 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-148 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 52
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-27HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0672h (NT)
2018-02-27HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 78
2018-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-02-01HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-02-01HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-0360h: 02/06/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback