NH HB1609 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to forfeiture of personal property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to forfeiture of personal property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-02-27HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2014-02-27HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for TBD (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14
2014-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2014-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 1/28/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2013-12-17HouseIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback