NH HB1605 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of latex gloves and utensils in the food service industry.
Title
Prohibiting the use of latex gloves and utensils in the food service industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Susan Ford [D] |
Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Susan Emerson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 180 N: 162 NV: 31 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/12/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0258h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-162 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 137 |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendment #2016-0258h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 136 |
2016-02-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 14 P. 56 |
2016-02-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0258h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 56 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2016 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building205 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 20 |