NH HB1601 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-20 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-20 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Summary
Requiring the inclusion of certain offenses against adults on the public sexual offender list.
Title
Requiring the inclusion of certain offenses against adults on the public sexual offender list.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-20 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-08-02 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/24/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-02-17 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.936 | |
2010-02-09 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (Vote 20-0); House Calendar 14, PG.583 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/26/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 6, PG.245 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2141&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |