NH HB160 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 158; eff. 08/27/17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to use of cannabis for therapeutic purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to use of cannabis for therapeutic purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 302 N: 46 NV: 18 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 158; eff. 08/27/17
2017-06-13HouseEnrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9
2017-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-01HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1631s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 2
2017-05-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1631s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1631s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1631s, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22
2017-04-28SenateSen. Bradley Moved to refer HB 160 back to Health and Human Services, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenatePending Motion, Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1378s; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-20SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1378s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14
2017-04-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1378s, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19
2017-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0681h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 302-46 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 126
2017-03-08HouseFLAM #2017-0681h (Rep. J. MacKay): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 126
2017-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-01-12HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 10:15 am Representatives Hall
2016-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback