NH HB1597 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 268; eff. 01/01/2024 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 268; eff. 01/01/2024 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting arraignments for felonies and preliminary examinations to be heard in circuit court.
Title
Permitting arraignments for felonies and preliminary examinations to be heard in circuit court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 268; eff. 01/01/2024 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1918s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2022-1918s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved Ought to Pass; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1559s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1559s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1559s, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 01/27/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |