NH HB1597 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to preservation of biological material in a criminal investigation for DNA testing.
Title
Relative to preservation of biological material in a criminal investigation for DNA testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 13 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 86 |
2016-03-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-03-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 20 |