NH HB1596 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a report on state government commitments and contingent liabilities.
Title
Requiring a report on state government commitments and contingent liabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Michael Abbott [D] |
Rep. John O'Day [R] | Rep. Kevin Scully [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 43 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 25 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-01-11 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-01-10 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 02:46 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-01-03 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 1 P. 16 |