NH HB1584 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/24/2016; Chapter 322; Eff. 1/1/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to body-worn cameras for law enforcement officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to body-worn cameras for law enforcement officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-28HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 06/24/2016; Chapter 322; Eff. 1/1/2017
2016-06-16HouseEnrolled 06/16/2016
2016-06-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/16/2016); Senate Journal 20
2016-06-14HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2150e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66
2016-06-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2150e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20
2016-06-01HouseConference Committee Report 2049c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 48
2016-06-01SenateConference Committee Report 2049c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19
2016-05-26SenateConference Committee Report Filed, #2016-2049c; 05/26/2016
2016-05-20HouseConference Committee Meeting: 05/24/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2016-05-19SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Daniels, Lasky; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18
2016-05-19SenateSen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18
2016-05-11HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Tholl, Cushing, Welch, DiSesa 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5
2016-05-11HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1366s and Requests CofC (Reps. Tholl, Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5
2016-04-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1366s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15
2016-04-28SenateCommittee Amendment 1366s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2016 Senate Journal 15
2016-04-28SenateWithout Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment #2016-1366s, New Title, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15
2016-04-28SenateChair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment, 04/28/2016 Senate Journal 15
2016-04-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1366s, New Title, 04/28/2016; Senate Calendar 16
2016-03-30SenateHearing: 04/07/2016, Room 100, State House, 12:00 pm, or Immediately Following Session if Session goes beyond 12:00 p.m. Senate Calendar 13
2016-03-30SenateIntroduced 03/24/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11
2016-03-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 7
2016-03-16HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 19 P. 5
2016-03-08HouseExecutive Session: 03/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2016-02-10HousePublic Hearing: 02/18/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2016-02-10HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 4
2016-02-10HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0100h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 4
2016-02-10HouseAmendment #2016-0100h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 4
2016-02-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0100h (NT) for 02/10/2016 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 3
2016-01-21HouseExecutive Session: 01/27/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2016-01-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/21/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building204
2016-01-07HousePublic Hearing: 01/14/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building204
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 19

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback