NH HB1583 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-02 - Executive Session: 09/14/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-02 - Executive Session: 09/14/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing for voluntary donations to veterans' organizations through a check-off box on driver's license applications and automobile registration forms.
Title
Allowing for voluntary donations to veterans' organizations through a check-off box on driver's license applications and automobile registration forms.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Joseph Hannon [R] | Rep. Caroletta Alicea [D] | Rep. Brad Bailey [R] |
Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Joshua Whitehouse [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-02 | House | Executive Session: 09/14/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-02-04 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/04/2016 House Journal 11 P. 9 |
2016-02-04 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/04/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 4 |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2016 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building203 |
2016-01-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 02:20 PM Legislative Office Building203 |
2016-01-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/12/2016 02:40 PM Legislative Office Building203 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Transportation House Journal 4 P. 19 |