NH HB1581 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to commencement of an administrative license suspension.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to commencement of an administrative license suspension.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15
2018-02-21SenateHearing: 03/06/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0258h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 39
2018-02-15HouseAmendment # 2018-0258h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 39
2018-02-09HouseSpecial Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81
2018-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0258h for 02/07/2018 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar)
2018-01-31HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 203
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 203
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback