NH HB158 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 131; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 131; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the managing agent to return the records of a condominium association upon the request of the association.
Title
Requiring the managing agent to return the records of a condominium association upon the request of the association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/12/2015; Chapter 131; Effective Date 1/1/2016 |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1592EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1780 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1592e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0049h: Motion Adopted DV 245-119; House Journal 24, PG. 834 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0049h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 834 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0049h for Mar 11 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 413-414 |
2015-02-26 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== |
2015-02-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/12/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 210 |