NH HB1578 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-30 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201
Pending: House Public Works and Highways Committee
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-30 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201
Pending: House Public Works and Highways Committee
Summary
Relative to state agency evaluation of contractors.
Title
Relative to state agency evaluation of contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-08-02 | House Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/22/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Public Works and Highways for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-03-03 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1156 | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for March 3 Consent Calendar (vote 12-0); House Calendar 17, PG.811 | |
2010-02-17 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/18/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-01-22 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==RECESSED== | |
2010-01-21 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/2/2010 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-01-13 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/26/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/21/2010 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 ==RECESSED== | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 6, PG.245 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2539&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |