NH HB1570 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/09/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building304
Hearing: Oct 9 @ 9:00 am in am Legislative Office Building304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the scope of rules adopted under the administrative procedures act pursuant to statutory authorization for agency rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the scope of rules adopted under the administrative procedures act pursuant to statutory authorization for agency rules.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/09/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building304
2018-09-10HouseExecutive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
2018-03-06HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 36
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 21
2018-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-23HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-09HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback