NH HB157 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 125; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 125; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding chronic pain to qualifying conditions under therapeutic use of cannabis.
Title
Adding chronic pain to qualifying conditions under therapeutic use of cannabis.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Schleien [R] | Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Edwards [D] | Rep. Nick Zaricki [R] |
Rep. Robert Fisher [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 301 N: 47 NV: 18 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 301 N: 47 NV: 18 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 125; Eff. 8/15/2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 47 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 18Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0682h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 301-47 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 124 |
2017-03-08 | House | FLAM #2017-0682h (Rep. J. MacKay): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 124 |
2017-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2017-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 10:03 am Representatives Hall |
2016-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 18 |