NH HB1567 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalties for prostitution and related offenses.
Title
Relative to the penalties for prostitution and related offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 3 |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 6 |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 15 |