NH HB1565 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transportation companies under the Medicaid managed care program.
Title
Relative to transportation companies under the Medicaid managed care program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 6 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/10/2016 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building205 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 19 |