NH HB1557 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Executive Session: 09/23/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98901909120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Executive Session: 09/23/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98901909120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a value added grant matching fund for New Hampshire agricultural producers.
Title
Establishing a value added grant matching fund for New Hampshire agricultural producers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 09/23/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98901909120 |
2020-02-19 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 11 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 7 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 26 |