NH HB155 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 59; Effective Date 8/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 59; Effective Date 8/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal contracts for police chief.
Title
Relative to municipal contracts for police chief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 59; Effective Date 8/1/2015 |
2015-05-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-02-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 304 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 11 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 176 |
2015-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/3/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 209 |