NH HB1547 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing voters to remove their names from the checklist.
Title
Authorizing voters to remove their names from the checklist.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 19 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/6/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Election Law |