NH HB1546 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the audio recording of a public servant performing a public function.
Title
Permitting the audio recording of a public servant performing a public function.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | Died on Table |
2016-03-10 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Burt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 111 |
2016-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 14 P. 85 |
2016-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0731h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 85 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2016 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 18 |