NH HB1545 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 251; Eff. 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 251; Eff. 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the statewide interoperability executive committee.
Title
Relative to the statewide interoperability executive committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 251; Eff. 8/11/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1777s (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1777s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1777s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1777s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 8 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/25/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 14 |