NH HB1541 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-05 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/14/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-05 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/14/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting placement of certain persons with a mental illness in the secure psychiatric unit, and authorizing the commissioner of the department of corrections to seek therapeutic alternatives.
Title
Prohibiting placement of certain persons with a mental illness in the secure psychiatric unit, and authorizing the commissioner of the department of corrections to seek therapeutic alternatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 09/14/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-04-13 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 40 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 23 |
2016-04-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 18 |