NH HB1538 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to credit card late fees and interest.
Title
Relative to credit card late fees and interest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/19/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 9 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 |