NH HB1535 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - House III. Remainder: Effective 7/18/2010

Summary

Relative to absentee voting, special elections, election returns, preservation of ballots, recounts, the ballot law commission, and electronic ballot counting devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to absentee voting, special elections, election returns, preservation of ballots, recounts, the ballot law commission, and electronic ballot counting devices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-21 House III. Remainder: Effective 7/18/2010
2010-07-21 House II. Sections 9, 26, 29, 30, 32, 39, 42, 43, 47, 54, 55, 57 & 72-83: Effective as provided in sec. 84
2010-07-21 House I. Sections 15 & 23 & RSA 657:19, III and IV as inserted by section 34: Effective 9/15/2010
2010-07-21 House Signed by the Governor 07/18/2010; Chapter 317
2010-06-02 House Enrolled
2010-06-02 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 21, Pg.778
2010-06-02 Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2358 Adopted; Senate Journal 21, Pg.767
2010-06-02 House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2358 Adopted
2010-05-19 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1840s(NT) (Rep Pierce): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2226
2010-05-12 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 18, Pg.498
2010-05-12 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1840s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 18, Pg.446
2010-05-12 Senate Committee Amendment 1840s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.446
2010-05-04 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1840s, New Title, 5/12/10; Senate Calendar 19
2010-03-18 Senate Hearing: March 23, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12
2010-03-17 Senate Introduced and Referred to Election Law and Veterans' Affairs, Senate Journal 10, Pg.172
2010-02-17 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0645h (New Title): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.938-951
2010-02-17 House Amendment #0645h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.938-951
2010-02-11 House Proposed Committee Amendment #0645h (New Title); House Calendar 14, PG.641-654
2010-02-11 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0645h (NT) for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (Vote 13-0); House Calendar 14, PG.585
2010-02-03 House Suspend House Rules, Ext Reporting Date to Feb 11 (Reps Clemons & Jasper): Motion Adopted Voice Vote Req 2/3; House Journal 15 PG746
2010-01-19 House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2010-01-19 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/9/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2010-01-14 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2010-01-14 House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/19/2010 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 (Orig 1:00 PM)
2009-12-10 House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 6, PG.243

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback