NH HB1534 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Pursuant to House Rule 35e HB 1534 returned to the Senate 05/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Pursuant to House Rule 35e HB 1534 returned to the Senate 05/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reports of death of voters and authorizing an electronic poll book trial program.
Title
Relative to reports of death of voters and authorizing an electronic poll book trial program.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bates [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1849s (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Pursuant to House Rule 35e HB 1534 returned to the Senate 05/13/2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1849s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1849s, New Title, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Amendment Adopted; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1849s, New Title, 05/12/2016; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Hearing: 04/27/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am, on proposed amendment #2016-1514s; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/13/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 22 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13 |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building308 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 17 |