NH HB1530 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 287-66 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 287-66 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mail-in voting.
Title
Relative to mail-in voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 287 N: 66 NV: 18 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 287-66 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 83 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 49 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building308 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 17 |